HI HB1267 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1267
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires HHFDC and each county to initiate a rent-controlled housing pilot project for new housing constructed in a total of 5 representative districts and for housing constructed in those districts prior to 1990. Appropriates funds.
Title
Relating To Rental Housing.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-02-14 | House | The committee(s) on HSG recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2017-02-10 | House | Bill scheduled for decison-making on Tuesday, 02-14-17 10:00AM in House conference room 423. |
2017-02-09 | House | The committee(s) on HSG recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2017-02-06 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Thursday, 02-09-17 9:00AM in House conference room 423. |
2017-01-30 | House | Referred to HSG, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2017-01-25 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-24 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1267 (Carry Over) 2017-02-14 - The committee(s) on HSG recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1267&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/HB1267_.HTM |