HI HB1267 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Makes appropriations to provide for health services and programs. Directs an additional portion of Tobacco Settlement Funds into the general fund. Effective July 1, 2030. (HB1267 HD1)
Title
Health Care; Appropriations; Tobacco Settlement Funds
Sponsors
Rep. Jerry Chang [D] | Rep. Pono Chong [D] | Rep. Isaac Choy [D] | Rep. Robert Herkes [D] |
Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] | Rep. Blake Oshiro [D] | Rep. Calvin Say [D] | Rep. Joseph Souki [D] |
Rep. Clift Tsuji [D] | Rep. Kyle Yamashita [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-01 | Carried over to 2012 Regular Session. | |
2011-03-18 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be HELD. The votes in HTH were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Nishihara, Baker, Chun Oakland, Shimabukuro, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2011-03-15 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-11 3:00PM in conference room 229. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Referred to HTH, WAM. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 297). | |
2011-03-08 | (H) Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Awana, Cullen, C. Lee, Marumoto, Wooley voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Rhoads, Takai, Takumi, Thielen voting no (4) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2011-03-04 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting no (0) and Cabanilla, Ching, C. Lee, McKelvey, Saiki, Takumi excused (6). | |
2011-03-04 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 674) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2011-03-02 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Chong, Choy, Coffman, Cullen, Har, Hashem, Ichiyama, Jordan, C. Lee, Morikawa, Tokioka, Yamashita, Riviere; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Marumoto; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward. | |
2011-03-02 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 03-02-11 3:45PM in conference room 308. | |
2011-03-01 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred until 03-02-11. | |
2011-03-01 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 03-01-11 4:30PM in conference room 308. | |
2011-03-01 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred until 03-01-11. | |
2011-02-26 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 02-28-11 5:30PM in conference room 308. | |
2011-02-15 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred. | |
2011-02-12 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-15-11 2:00PM in House conference room 308. | |
2011-02-11 | (H) Re-referred to FIN, referral sheet 17 | |
2011-01-28 | (H) Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 3 | |
2011-01-26 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2011-01-25 | (H) Pending introduction. |