HI HB1257 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1257
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Transfers the invasive species council from the department of land and natural resources to the department of agriculture for administrative purposes.
Title
Relating To The Invasive Species Council.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-02-09 | House | The committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2021-02-05 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Tuesday, 02-09-21 9:15AM in House conference room 430 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-01 | House | Referred to WAL, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1257 (Carry Over) 2021-02-09 - The committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1257&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/HB1257_.HTM |