HI HB1257 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1257
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Enables condominium associations to adopt rules and regulations that: require unit owners to prohibit smoking inside a condominium unit as part of a lease agreement; and prohibit smoking on a lanai of a condominium unit and in all common elements.
Title
Relating To Condominiums.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-02-07 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2019-02-05 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 02-07-19 2:30PM in conference room 329. |
2019-02-05 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-07-19. |
2019-01-30 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 02-05-19 2:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to CPC, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB269 (Same As) 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
HB1257 (Carry Over) 2019-02-07 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
HB1257 (Carry Over) 2019-02-07 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1257&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HB1257_.HTM |