HI HB1257 | 2018 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB1257

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Allows permits that authorize the defendant to operate an employer's vehicle during the period of license revocation to be supported by the employer's sworn statement attesting to the period of the specified assigned hours of work that the defendant will drive the vehicle for purposes of employment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Driving While Intoxicated.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-11-30 Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
2017-02-08HouseThe committee(s) on TRN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
2017-02-03HouseBill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Wednesday, 02-08-17 9:00AM in House conference room 423.
2017-01-30HouseReferred to TRN, JUD, referral sheet 6
2017-01-25HousePass First Reading
2017-01-24HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

HB1257 (Carry Over) 2017-02-08 - The committee(s) on TRN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback