HI HB1257 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies the authority of the Board of Land and Natural Resources and Hawaii Tourism Authority to expend Transient Accommodations Tax revenues deposited into the special land and development fund. (HB1257 HD1)
Title
Transient Accommodations Tax; Special Land and Development Fund
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Brower [D] | Rep. Isaac Choy [D] | Rep. Ken Ito [D] | Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] |
Rep. Richard Onishi [D] | Sen. Joy San Buenaventura [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-17 | Carried over to 2016 Regular Session. | |
2015-02-09 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on WAL with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Matsumoto excused (2). |
2015-02-09 | House | Reported from TOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 27) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to WAL. |
2015-02-04 | House | The committees on TOU recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Brower, Ohno, Cachola, Choy, Ito, Kawakami, Onishi, Tokioka, Tsuji, Woodson, Matsumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Kong; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2015-02-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TOU on Wednesday, 02-04-15 9:30AM in House conference room 312. |
2015-02-02 | House | Referred to TOU, WAL, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2015-01-29 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2015-01-28 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB284 (Same As)