HI HB1257 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-18 - (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Carroll, Herkes, McKelvey, Morita excused (4).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-18 - (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Carroll, Herkes, McKelvey, Morita excused (4).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Public Utilities Commission to consider technology, carbon emissions, and cost to consumers when considering requirements for electricity generated from nonfossil fuels. (HB1257 HD1)
Title
Public Utilities Commission; Certificate of Public Convenience and Necessity
Sponsors
Rep. Karen Awana [D] | Rep. Jerry Chang [D] | Rep. Cindy Evans [D] | Rep. Faye Hanohano [D] |
Rep. Sharon Har [D] | Rep. Linda Ichiyama [D] | Rep. Ken Ito [D] | Rep. Mark Nakashima [D] |
Rep. Joseph Souki [D] | Rep. Clift Tsuji [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-18 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Carroll, Herkes, McKelvey, Morita excused (4). | |
2011-02-18 | (H) Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 536) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. | |
2011-02-02 | (H) The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Herkes, Yamane, Brower, Cabanilla, Ito, Keith-Agaran, Luke, McKelvey, B. Oshiro, Souki, Tsuji, Marumoto, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Carroll, Morita, Ching. | |
2011-01-28 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-02-11 2:05PM in House conference room 325. | |
2011-01-26 | (H) Referred to CPC, JUD, referral sheet 2 | |
2011-01-26 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2011-01-25 | (H) Pending introduction. |