HI HB1253 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 28 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-04-28 - Transmitted to Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits employers, with certain exemptions, from requiring employees and prospective employees to download to their personal communication device, a mobile application that enables the employee's location to be tracked or the employee's personal information to be revealed, as a condition of employment or continued employment. Prohibits employers from terminating, discharging, or otherwise discriminating against an employee for refusing to download or refusing to consent to download the mobile application to the employee's personal communication device; or opposing any practice forbidden by this Act or filing a complaint, testifying, or assisting in any proceeding concerning an unlawful practice prohibited under this Act. Allows a person who alleges a violation of this Act to bring a civil action for injunctive relief, actual damages, or both. Sets fines. (CD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Employment Practices.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 2 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Senate Labor, Culture and the Arts: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - House - House Labor & Tourism: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-28HouseTransmitted to Governor.
2021-04-28SenateReceived notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 634).
2021-04-28HouseReceived notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 858).
2021-04-27HousePassed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) LoPresti excused (1).
2021-04-27SenatePassed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
2021-04-22Senate48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-27-21.
2021-04-22SenateReported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 34).
2021-04-22HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 04-27-21.
2021-04-22HouseReported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 34) as amended in (CD 1).
2021-04-21SenateThe Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Keohokalole.
2021-04-21HouseThe Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Onishi, Kitagawa, Matayoshi, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
2021-04-20HouseBill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 04-21-21 10:05AM in conference room CR 309.
2021-04-20HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 842).
2021-04-19SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: Taniguchi Chair; Rhoads Co-Chair; Keohokalole.
2021-04-19SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 560).
2021-04-16HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: Onishi, Kitagawa, Matayoshi Co-Chairs; Okimoto.
2021-04-16SenateReceived notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 558).
2021-04-15HouseHouse disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
2021-04-13HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 767) in amended form (SD 1).
2021-04-13SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2021-04-09SenateOne Day Notice 04-13-21.
2021-04-09SenateReported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1616) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
2021-04-07SenateThe committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Lee.
2021-04-01SenateThe committee(s) on JDC deferred the measure until 04-07-21 10:30AM; Via Videoconference.
2021-03-25SenateThe committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 04-01-21 9:35AM; Via Videoconference.
2021-03-25SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
2021-03-25SenateReported from LCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1262) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC.
2021-03-17SenateThe committee(s) on LCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LCA were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Ihara, Chang, Keohokalole, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2021-03-12SenateThe committee(s) on LCA has scheduled a public hearing on 03-17-21 3:30PM; CR 225 & Videoconference.
2021-03-11SenateReferred to LCA, JDC.
2021-03-11SenatePassed First Reading.
2021-03-11SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 295).
2021-03-09HousePassed Third Reading as amended in HD 3 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Ward voting no (1) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
2021-03-05HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-09-21.
2021-03-05HouseReported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 869) as amended in HD 3, recommending passage on Third Reading.
2021-03-02HouseThe committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, D. Kobayashi, LoPresti, McKelvey, Nakamura, Takumi, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Lowen, Todd.
2021-02-26HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 03-02-21 2:00PM in conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
2021-02-26HouseThe committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-02-21 at 2:00PM in Room 325.
2021-02-24HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Friday, 02-26-21 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
2021-02-19HouseReport adopted. referred to the committee(s) on JHA as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Kong, Matayoshi excused (3).
2021-02-19HouseReported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 503) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to JHA.
2021-02-16HouseThe committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Aquino, Har, Kong, Mizuno, Morikawa, Onishi, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem.
2021-02-12HouseBill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 02-16-21 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
2021-02-11HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ohno excused (1).
2021-02-11HouseReported from LAT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 153) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
2021-02-09HouseThe committees on LAT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Onishi, Sayama, Belatti, Holt, D. Kobayashi, Takayama, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Quinlan.
2021-02-05HouseBill scheduled to be heard by LAT on Tuesday, 02-09-21 9:30AM in House conference room 312 Via Videoconference.
2021-02-05HouseRe-referred to LAT, CPC, JHA, referral sheet 8
2021-02-01HouseReferred to CPC, JHA, referral sheet 3
2021-01-27HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback