HI HB1253 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the department of human services to identify suitable properties for a housing first program that identifies affordable rental housing projects, including an initial housing first single resident occupancy affordable rental housing model project site in an urban core. Requires DHS to report to the legislature and the governor.
Title
Homelessness; Housing First
Sponsors
Rep. Della au Belatti [D] | Rep. Tom Brower [D] | Rep. Scott Nishimoto [D] | Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-01 | Carried over to 2012 Regular Session. | |
2011-02-09 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred. | |
2011-02-04 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG/WLO on Wednesday, 02-09-11 10:45AM in House conference room 325. | |
2011-01-26 | (H) Referred to HSG/WLO, FIN, referral sheet 2 | |
2011-01-26 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2011-01-25 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1253 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2012/Bills/HB1253_.HTM |