HI HB1246 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-23-21 1:00PM; Via Videoconference.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Specifies that certain violations of the Fireworks Control Law shall be considered an activity that causes air pollution under the Hawaii Air Pollution Control Act and a violation of noise control rules under the Hawaii noise pollution laws, and punishable by civil penalties and subject to citations under those respective laws. Effective 1/1/2050. (HD2)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Fireworks.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-02 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-18SenateThe committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-23-21 1:00PM; Via Videoconference.
2021-03-15SenateRe-Referred to PSM, JDC.
2021-03-11SenateReferred to PSM/HTH, JDC.
2021-03-11SenatePassed First Reading.
2021-03-11SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 294).
2021-03-09HousePassed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Kapela, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) DeCoite, D. Kobayashi, McDermott, McKelvey, Okimoto, Tokioka voting no (6) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
2021-03-05HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-09-21.
2021-03-05HouseReported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 884) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
2021-03-02HouseThe committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, LoPresti, Takumi; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) McKelvey, Nakamura, Ward; 2 Noes: Representative(s) D. Kobayashi, Tokioka; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Lowen, Todd.
2021-02-26HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 03-02-21 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
2021-02-17HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with Representative(s) Ganaden, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) D. Kobayashi, McDermott voting no (2) and Representative(s) Hashem excused (1).
2021-02-17HouseReported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 299) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
2021-02-09HouseThe committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Aquino, Har, Hashem, Kong, Mizuno, Morikawa, Onishi, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2021-02-05HouseBill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 02-09-21 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
2021-02-01HouseReferred to CPC, JHA, referral sheet 3
2021-01-27HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback