HI HB1245 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1245
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-09 - Referred to JDC, WAM.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-09 - Referred to JDC, WAM.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes an expeditious adjudication system for the processing of fireworks infractions. Appropriates funds. Effective 1/1/2050. (HD2)
Title
Relating To Fireworks Infractions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-24 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-09 | Senate | Referred to JDC, WAM. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 98). |
2021-03-04 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) D. Kobayashi, McDermott voting no (2) and Representative(s) Takumi excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2021-03-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 708), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2021-02-24 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Wildberger, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) McDermott; and Excused: none. |
2021-02-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-24-21 2:00PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-19 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and Representative(s) Har, Kong, Matayoshi excused (3). |
2021-02-19 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 568) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2021-02-16 | House | The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, LoPresti, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Todd, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) D. Kobayashi; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Takumi, Tokioka. |
2021-02-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 02-16-21 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-12 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Hashimoto excused (3). |
2021-02-12 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 242) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA. |
2021-02-09 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Aquino, Har, Hashem, Kong, Mizuno, Morikawa, Onishi, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2021-02-05 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 02-09-21 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-05 | House | Re-referred to CPC, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 7 |
2021-02-01 | House | Referred to CPC/JHA, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1245 (Carry Over) 2021-03-09 - Referred to JDC, WAM.