HI HB1235 | 2023 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Foward to future HB1235

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-10 - Referred to PSM, JDC, WAM.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Appropriates funds for purchasing digital cameras for all adult correctional officer control rooms at state correctional facilities and body cameras for adult correctional officers to wear while on duty at state correctional facilities. Effective 6/30/3000. (HD2)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Corrections.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-10SenateReferred to PSM, JDC, WAM.
2023-03-09SenatePassed First Reading.
2023-03-09SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 419).
2023-03-07HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
2023-03-03HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1163), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2023-03-01HouseThe committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Cochran, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nishimoto.
2023-02-27HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-01-23 10:00AM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
2023-02-16HouseReport adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Todd excused (1).
2023-02-16HouseReported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 527) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
2023-02-10HouseThe committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Ganaden, Holt, Hashimoto, Ichiyama, Ilagan, Kong, Mizuno, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2023-02-08HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Friday, 02-10-23 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
2023-02-08HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
2023-02-08HouseReported from CMV (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 188) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
2023-02-03HouseThe committee on CMV recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Hashem, Chun, Ganaden, Ichiyama, Morikawa, Poepoe, Takayama, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2023-01-31HouseBill scheduled to be heard by CMV on Friday, 02-03-23 9:00AM in House conference room 430 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
2023-01-30HouseReferred to CMV, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 3
2023-01-25HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2023-01-24HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

HB1235 (Carry Over) 2023-03-10 - Referred to PSM, JDC, WAM.
SB1470 (Same As) 2023-03-09 - Referred to CMV, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 17

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback