HI HB1231 | 2023 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Foward to future HB1231

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-10 - Referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the misdemeanor offense of criminal property damage in the third degree to include intentionally or knowingly damaging the property of another that is used in a business operation, without the other's consent in an amount exceeding $100. Effective 6/30/3000. (HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Criminal Property Damage.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-10SenateReferred to JDC.
2023-03-09SenatePassed First Reading.
2023-03-09SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 418).
2023-03-07HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
2023-03-02HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
2023-03-02HouseReported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 822) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2023-02-24HouseThe committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Ganaden, Hashimoto, Ichiyama, Ilagan, Kong, Mizuno, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Holt.
2023-02-22HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Friday, 02-24-23 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
2023-01-30HouseReferred to JHA, referral sheet 3
2023-01-25HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2023-01-24HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

HB1231 (Carry Over) 2023-03-10 - Referred to JDC.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback