HI HB1231 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1231
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows a qualified applicant to change their sex designation on their own birth certificate.
Title
Relating To Vital Statistics.
Sponsors
Rep. Patrick Branco [D] | Rep. Jeanne Kapela [D] | Rep. Matthew Lopresti [D] | Rep. Lisa Marten [D] |
Rep. Amy Perruso [D] | Rep. Adrian Tam [D] | Rep. Tina Wildberger [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-02-01 | House | Referred to HHH, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-26 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB281 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
HB1231 (Carry Over) 2021-02-01 - Referred to HHH, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 3
HB1231 (Carry Over) 2021-02-01 - Referred to HHH, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 3
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1231&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/HB1231_.HTM |