HI HB1231 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-28 - Referred to LHE, TIA, FIN, referral sheet 6
Pending: House Lower and Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Appropriates funds to the University of Hawaii to fund one or more programs sponsored or organized by a University of Hawaii community college or a four-year campus to expand opportunities for international college experiences for University of Hawaii students. Requires the University of Hawaii to work in collaboration with the department of business, economic development, and tourism and requires a report to be submitted to the legislature.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To International Education Programs.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-28HouseReferred to LHE, TIA, FIN, referral sheet 6
2019-01-24HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2019-01-23HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB200 (Same As) 2019-02-13 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback