HI HB1230 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-11 - Act 116, on 07/10/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1217).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-11 - Act 116, on 07/10/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1217).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the issuance of special purpose revenue bonds to assist MauiGrown Coffee, Inc. with the operation and expansion of its farm and mill. (SD2)
Title
Relating To The Issuance Of Special Purpose Revenue Bonds To Assist Mauigrown Coffee, Inc.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-11 | House | Act 116, on 07/10/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1217). |
2017-07-11 | Senate | Act 116, 07/10/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1217). |
2017-05-03 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 643). |
2017-05-02 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1). |
2017-05-02 | House | House agrees to Senate amendment(s). |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 640). |
2017-04-28 | House | Reconsideration of action taken on 04-11-17. |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Received notice of change in conferees (Hse. Com. No. 636). |
2017-04-28 | House | House Conferee(s) discharged. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 586). |
2017-04-17 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Creagan, DeCoite Co-Chairs; McKelvey, Thielen. |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 584). |
2017-04-11 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2017-04-07 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 534) in amended form (SD 2). |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 22; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 3 (Senator(s) English, Espero, Wakai). Transmitted to House. |
2017-04-05 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-07-17. |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1346) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2017-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Inouye, K. Kahele, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Taniguchi. |
2017-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-28-17 9:30AM in conference room 211. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 950) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2017-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Riviere, Nishihara, K. Rhoads, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-17 1:15PM in conference room 224. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Referred to AEN, WAM. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 172). |
2017-03-03 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama, McDermott excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2017-03-03 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 911), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2017-03-01 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Choy, Gates, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Nakamura, Tokioka, Quinlan, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) DeCoite, Holt, Tupola. |
2017-02-27 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-01-17 11:00AM in House conference room 308. |
2017-02-14 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2017-02-14 | House | Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 261) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2017-02-03 | House | The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Creagan, DeCoite, Gates, Ing, LoPresti, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2017-02-02 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2017-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Friday, 02-03-17 8:30AM in House conference room 312. |
2017-01-30 | House | Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2017-01-25 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-24 | House | Pending introduction. |