HI HB1228 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1228
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes biennial requirements of forty credit hours in specified continuing medical education programs for renewal of physician assistant licenses, beginning with the renewal for the licensing biennium on 2/1/2020, and every biennial renewal thereafter. Authorizes the Hawaii Medical Board to conduct random document audits to enforce compliance. Specifies conditions for forfeiture and reinstatement of a license.
Title
Relating To Physician Assistants.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Hashem [D] | Rep. Rida Cabanilla Arakawa [D] | Rep. Sharon Har [D] | Rep. Linda Ichiyama [D] |
Rep. Bertrand Kobayashi [D] | Rep. John Mizuno [D] | Rep. Romy Cachola [D] | Sen. Joy San Buenaventura [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to HLT, IAC, CPC, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB810 (Same As) 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
HB1228 (Carry Over) 2019-01-28 - Referred to HLT, IAC, CPC, referral sheet 6
HB1228 (Carry Over) 2019-01-28 - Referred to HLT, IAC, CPC, referral sheet 6
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1228&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HB1228_.HTM |