HI HB1227 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-28 - Referred to LHE, JUD, referral sheet 6
Pending: House Lower and Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires each campus of the University of Hawaii to establish a free speech policy that includes a process for students to report alleged violations of free speech rights. Requires the policy to be disseminated to certain employees and be included in the campus's student handbook, student orientation program, and website. Requires annual report summarizing any complaints alleging violation of free speech rights.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Free Speech.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-28HouseReferred to LHE, JUD, referral sheet 6
2019-01-24HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2019-01-23HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB28 (Same As) 2019-01-17 - Referred to CPH.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback