HI HB1225 | 2018 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB1225

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Appropriates funds to SFCA to fund celebrations for the 50th anniversary of the Hawaii state capitol. (HB1225 HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To The Fiftieth Anniversary Of The Hawaii State Capitol.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-11-30 Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
2017-02-17HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2).
2017-02-17HouseReported from VMI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 593) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2017-02-16HouseThe committees on VMI recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Ito, Tokioka, Cachola, Choy, Ohno, Woodson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Onishi, Ward.
2017-02-13HouseBill scheduled to be heard by VMI on Thursday, 02-16-17 9:30AM in House conference room 429.
2017-01-30HouseReferred to VMI, FIN, referral sheet 6
2017-01-25HousePass First Reading
2017-01-24HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

HB1225 (Carry Over) 2017-02-17 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2).

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback