HI HB1225 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1225
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-17 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-17 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds to SFCA to fund celebrations for the 50th anniversary of the Hawaii state capitol. (HB1225 HD1)
Title
Relating To The Fiftieth Anniversary Of The Hawaii State Capitol.
Sponsors
Rep. Ken Ito [D] | Rep. Romy Cachola [D] | Rep. Isaac Choy [D] | Rep. Richard Onishi [D] |
Rep. Gene Ward [R] | Rep. Justin Woodson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-17 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2). |
2017-02-17 | House | Reported from VMI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 593) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2017-02-16 | House | The committees on VMI recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Ito, Tokioka, Cachola, Choy, Ohno, Woodson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Onishi, Ward. |
2017-02-13 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by VMI on Thursday, 02-16-17 9:30AM in House conference room 429. |
2017-01-30 | House | Referred to VMI, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2017-01-25 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-24 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1225 (Carry Over) 2017-02-17 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2).