HI HB1225 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes a transportation carrier commission to regulate water and motor carriers. Removes such carriers from the jurisdiction of the public utilities commission.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Transportation Carrier Commission; Creation

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2009-05-11 Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
2009-02-11 (H) The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be HELD. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Souki, Awana, Aquino, Hanohano, Keith-Agaran, M. Lee, Nakashima, Rhoads, Saiki, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Takumi, Pine.
2009-02-05 (H) Bill re-scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-11-09 8:30am in conference room 309.
2009-02-05 (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-11-09 8:30am in conference room 306.
2009-02-04 (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred until 02-11-09.
2009-01-30 (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Wednesday, 02-04-09 8:30am in House conference room 309.
2009-01-30 (H) Referred to TRN, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 4
2009-01-28 (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading.
2009-01-26 (H) Pending introduction.

Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback