HI HB1222 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1222
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-17 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-17 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals requirement that a disabled veteran be in receipt of disability retirement pay in order to be exempt from the payment of annual vehicle registration fees.
Title
Relating To Exemptions From Registration Fees.
Sponsors
Rep. Ken Ito [D] | Rep. Romy Cachola [D] | Rep. Isaac Choy [D] | Rep. Beth Fukumoto Chang [R] |
Rep. Richard Onishi [D] | Rep. James Tokioka [D] | Rep. Gene Ward [R] | Rep. Justin Woodson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-17 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2). |
2017-02-17 | House | Reported from VMI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 592), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2017-02-16 | House | The committees on VMI recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Ito, Tokioka, Cachola, Choy, Ohno, Woodson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Onishi, Ward. |
2017-02-13 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by VMI on Thursday, 02-16-17 9:30AM in House conference room 429. |
2017-01-30 | House | Referred to VMI, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2017-01-25 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-24 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1222 (Carry Over) 2017-02-17 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2).
SB602 (Same As) 2017-04-28 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-17 1:00PM in conference room 312.
SB602 (Same As) 2017-04-28 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-17 1:00PM in conference room 312.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1222&year=2017 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2017/bills/HB1222_.HTM |