HI HB1220 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-13 - The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends definition of "qualified patient" to include pediatric dental benefits as provided under the federal Affordable Care Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Keiki Dental Health Coverage

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-02-13HouseThe committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
2013-02-08HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-13-13 8:30AM in conference room 329.
2013-02-08HouseThe committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-13-13 at 8:30am.
2013-02-06HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 02-08-13 8:30AM in conference room 329.
2013-02-06HouseThe committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-08-13 at 8:30am.
2013-02-01HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-06-13 10:00AM in conference room 329.
2013-02-01HouseThe committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
2013-01-29HouseBill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Friday, 02-01-13 8:30AM in House conference room 329.
2013-01-28HouseReferred to HLT, CPC, referral sheet 6
2013-01-24HouseIntroduced and Passed First Reading
2013-01-23HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB1240 (Same As) 2013-04-01 - The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.

Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback