HI HB1217 | 2020 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB1217

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Makes inclusion of an affidavit application for voter registration mandatory for all driver's license and identification card applications. Automatically registers each applicant who elects to register for voting. Requires sharing of information among the counties, DOT, and election personnel. (HB1217 HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Voter Registration.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-12-01 Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
2019-04-01SenateThe committee on JDC has deleted the measure from decision making scheduled on 04-02-19 10:10AM in conference room 016.
2019-03-29SenateThe committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 04-02-19 10:10AM in conference room 016.
2019-03-21SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC.
2019-03-21SenateReported from TRS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1325) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC.
2019-03-15SenateThe committee(s) on TRS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TRS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Harimoto, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Fevella.
2019-03-12SenateThe committee(s) on TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-19 10:45AM in conference room 225.
2019-03-08SenateRe-Referred to TRS, JDC.
2019-03-07SenateReferred to JDC.
2019-03-07SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-03-07SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 455).
2019-03-05HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-02-28HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1).
2019-02-28HouseReported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 958) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2019-02-08HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Lowen, Morikawa, Say, Takayama, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) McKelvey, Thielen.
2019-02-05HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 02-08-19 2:00PM in conference room 325.
2019-02-01HouseThe committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-08-19.
2019-01-31HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 02-01-19 2:01PM in conference room 325.
2019-01-31HouseThe committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-01-19.
2019-01-29HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 01-31-19 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
2019-01-28HouseReferred to JUD, referral sheet 6
2019-01-24HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2019-01-23HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

HB1217 (Carry Over) 2019-04-01 - The committee on JDC has deleted the measure from decision making scheduled on 04-02-19 10:10AM in conference room 016.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback