HI HB121 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-01-22 - Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 2
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-01-22 - Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 2
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the important agricultural land qualified agricultural cost tax credit by (1) clarifying the amount of the credit; (2) repealing the requirement that qualified agricultural costs be reduced by the amount of funds received from the irrigation repair and maintenance special fund; and (3) repealing the filing deadline to claim the credit.
Title
Taxation; Important agricultural land qualified agricultural cost tax credit
Sponsors
Rep. Isaac Choy [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2013-01-18 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB585 (Same As) 2013-02-11 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=121&year=2013 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2013/Bills/HB121_.HTM |