HI HB1209 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1209
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Commission to file annual reports on the status of the progress of five-year boundary review. Requires counties to file annual updates to general plans, development plans, or community plans. (HB1209 HD2)
Title
Relating To Housing.
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Brower [D] | Sen. Troy Hashimoto [D] | Rep. Mark Nakashima [D] | Rep. Takashi Ohno [D] |
Rep. Sean Quinlan [D] | Rep. Calvin Say [D] | Rep. Justin Woodson [D] | Rep. Scot Matayoshi [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-28 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House Water, Land, & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House Housing: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House Water, Land, & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House Housing: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 03-21-19 1:45PM in conference room 225. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-21-19 1:45PM in conference room 225. |
2019-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 03-19-19 1:20PM in conference room 225. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-19 1:20PM in conference room 225. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Re-Referred to HOU, WAM. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to HOU/EET, WAM. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 454). |
2019-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Quinlan excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1246), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2019-02-28 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2019-02-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-28-19 2:05PM in House conference room 308. |
2019-02-15 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5). |
2019-02-15 | House | Reported from WLH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 788) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2019-02-13 | House | The committees on WLH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Todd, Har, Tarnas, Wildberger, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Lowen. |
2019-02-11 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WLH on Wednesday, 02-13-19 11:15AM in House conference room 325. |
2019-02-07 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on WLH with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakamura, Thielen excused (2). |
2019-02-07 | House | Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 141) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to WLH. |
2019-01-31 | House | The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Brower, Matayoshi, Cullen, Hashem, Hashimoto, Woodson, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino. |
2019-01-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Thursday, 01-31-19 9:30AM in House conference room 423. |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to HSG, WLH, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1209 (Carry Over) 2019-03-18 - The committee(s) on HOU deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 03-21-19 1:45PM in conference room 225.