HI HB1209 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-18 - The committee(s) on HOU deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 03-21-19 1:45PM in conference room 225.
Pending: Senate Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the Commission to file annual reports on the status of the progress of five-year boundary review. Requires counties to file annual updates to general plans, development plans, or community plans. (HB1209 HD2)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Housing.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18SenateThe committee(s) on HOU deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 03-21-19 1:45PM in conference room 225.
2019-03-18SenateThe committee(s) on HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-21-19 1:45PM in conference room 225.
2019-03-15SenateThe committee(s) on HOU deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 03-19-19 1:20PM in conference room 225.
2019-03-13SenateThe committee(s) on HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-19 1:20PM in conference room 225.
2019-03-11SenateRe-Referred to HOU, WAM.
2019-03-07SenateReferred to HOU/EET, WAM.
2019-03-07SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-03-07SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 454).
2019-03-05HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Quinlan excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-03-01HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1246), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2019-02-28HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2019-02-28HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-28-19 2:05PM in House conference room 308.
2019-02-15HouseReport adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5).
2019-02-15HouseReported from WLH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 788) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
2019-02-13HouseThe committees on WLH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Todd, Har, Tarnas, Wildberger, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Lowen.
2019-02-11HouseBill scheduled to be heard by WLH on Wednesday, 02-13-19 11:15AM in House conference room 325.
2019-02-07HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on WLH with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakamura, Thielen excused (2).
2019-02-07HouseReported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 141) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to WLH.
2019-01-31HouseThe committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Brower, Matayoshi, Cullen, Hashem, Hashimoto, Woodson, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino.
2019-01-28HouseBill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Thursday, 01-31-19 9:30AM in House conference room 423.
2019-01-28HouseReferred to HSG, WLH, FIN, referral sheet 6
2019-01-24HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2019-01-23HousePending introduction.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback