HI HB1209 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-30 - Referred to HLT, CPC, referral sheet 6
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Beginning January 1, 2018, requires all sugar-sweetened beverages to contain a warning label.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Health.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-01-30HouseReferred to HLT, CPC, referral sheet 6
2017-01-25HousePass First Reading
2017-01-24HousePending introduction.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback