HI HB1209 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 9 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-18 - Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 710).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the legislative broadcast program to make an audio or audiovisual recording of all public hearings and informational briefings held at the State Capitol, and maintain an archive of the recordings to be made available to the public. Appropriates an unspecified sum to be shared equally between the senate and the house of representatives. Effective 7/1/30. (SD2)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Access Room; Legislative Broadcast Program; Record; Appropriation ($)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-04-18HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 710).
2013-04-18SenateSenate Conferees appointed: Wakai, Chair; Nishihara, Chun Oakland, Co-Chair(s); Kouchi, Slom.
2013-04-16SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 697).
2013-04-15HouseHouse conferees appointed: Nishimoto, Tokioka Co-Chairs; Mizuno, Johanson.
2013-04-12SenateReceived notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 650).
2013-04-11HouseHouse disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
2013-04-09HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 570) in amended form (SD 2).
2013-04-09SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2013-04-05SenateDeferred until 04-09-13.
2013-04-03Senate48 Hrs. Notice 04-05-13.
2013-04-03SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1261) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2013-03-28SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Kouchi.
2013-03-25SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-28-13 9:05AM in conference room 211.
2013-03-22SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2013-03-22SenateReported from TEC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1028) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2013-03-21SenateThe committee(s) on TEC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TEC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Nishihara, Gabbard, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Tokuda.
2013-03-19SenateThe committee(s) on TEC deferred the measure until 03-21-13 1:20PM in conference room 414.
2013-03-08SenateThe committee(s) on TEC has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-13 1:25PM in conference room 414.
2013-03-07SenateReferred to TEC, WAM.
2013-03-07SenatePassed First Reading.
2013-03-07SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 340).
2013-03-05HousePassed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
2013-03-01HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-13.
2013-03-01HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 882) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading.
2013-02-25HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2013-02-22HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 02-25-13 1:30PM in House conference room 308.
2013-02-07HousePassed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Cachola, Har excused (2).
2013-02-07HouseReported from LMG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 182), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2013-02-01HouseThe committees on LMG recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, Mizuno, Awana, Cachola, Saiki, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McKelvey.
2013-01-30HouseBill scheduled to be heard by LMG on Friday, 02-01-13 2:00PM in House conference room 423.
2013-01-28HouseReferred to LMG, FIN, referral sheet 6
2013-01-24HouseIntroduced and Passed First Reading
2013-01-23HousePending introduction.

Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback