HI HB1209 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Redefines the practice of dentistry to include tooth whitening. (HB1209 HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Dentistry

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2009-05-11 Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
2009-02-19 (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting no (0) and Takai, Takumi, Ward excused (3).
2009-02-18 (H) Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 467) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
2009-02-13 (H) The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Nishimoto, Belatti, Bertram, Brower, Carroll, Mizuno, Shimabukuro, Finnegan; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2009-02-10 (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Friday, 02-13-09 8:30am in House conference room 329.
2009-01-30 (H) Referred to HLT, CPC, referral sheet 4
2009-01-28 (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading.
2009-01-26 (H) Pending introduction.

Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback