HI HB1205 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1205
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-01 - Referred to ECD, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3
Pending: House Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-01 - Referred to ECD, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3
Pending: House Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires a public investment fund to develop, publish, and implement socially responsible investment policies applicable to the management of all public funds under the public investment fund's control and submit an annual report to the legislature on disclosing its investments in accord with environmental, social, and governance investing and socially responsible investment policies.
Title
Relating To Sustainable Investing.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-01 | House | Referred to ECD, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-26 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1205 (Carry Over) 2021-02-01 - Referred to ECD, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3
SB801 (Same As) 2021-02-03 - Re-Referred to GVO, WAM/JDC.
SB801 (Same As) 2021-02-03 - Re-Referred to GVO, WAM/JDC.
Subjects
Environmental, Social, And Governance Investing
Public Investment Funds
Socially Responsible Investing
Sustainable Investing
Public Investment Funds
Socially Responsible Investing
Sustainable Investing
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1205&year=2021 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2021/bills/HB1205_.HTM |