HI HB1205 | 2018 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB1205

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-17 - Re-referred to IAC/HHS, JUD, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Intrastate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Provides protections against burdensome retroactive regulation and lawsuits; prevents frivolous claims against shooting range operators and individuals engaging in target shooting.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Shooting Range Protection.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-17HouseRe-referred to IAC/HHS, JUD, referral sheet 1
2017-11-30 Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
2017-01-30HouseReferred to IAC/HLT, JUD, referral sheet 6
2017-01-25HousePass First Reading
2017-01-24HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

HB1205 (Carry Over) 2017-01-30 - Referred to IAC/HLT, JUD, referral sheet 6

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback