HI HB1205 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-02 - Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 6
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes and appropriates funds for the Hawaii-grown food procurement task force for the purpose of creating recommendations for increasing procurement of food grown in Hawaii by State departments and agencies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Hawaii-grown Food Procurement Task Force; Procurement; Appropriation ($)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-02-02HouseReferred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 6
2015-01-29HouseIntroduced and Passed First Reading
2015-01-28HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB542 (Same As) 2015-01-26 - Referred to AGL/GVO, WAM.

Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback