HI HB1196 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Recognizes the burden upon religious freedom as a claim or a defense against government acts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Religious Freedom; Damages

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-12-18 Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
2013-01-28HouseReferred to JUD, referral sheet 6
2013-01-24HouseIntroduced and Passed First Reading
2013-01-23HousePending introduction.

Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback