HI HB1194 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-02 - The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits drivers from operating vehicles with more than four wheels and high-passenger cars in the left lane, or close to the left-hand curb or left-hand edge, of a state or county roadway. Exempts drivers operating public transportation vehicles in a zipper lane or diamond lane.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To The Statewide Traffic Code.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-02HouseThe committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
2021-02-26HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 03-02-21 2:00PM in conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
2021-02-26HouseThe committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-02-21 at 2:00PM in Room 325.
2021-02-24HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Friday, 02-26-21 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
2021-02-01HouseReferred to JHA, referral sheet 3
2021-01-27HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2021-01-26HousePending introduction.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback