HI HB1191 | 2020 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB1191

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Provides an income tax credit for qualifying small businesses to offset the increase in the minimum hourly wage that employers must pay employees. Increases the minimum wage to $12.00 per hour beginning 1/1/2020 and $15.00 per hour beginning 1/1/2023. Establishes a minimum wage of $17.00 per hour for any person employed in a full-time position with the State of Hawaii beginning upon approval of the Act. Tax credit applies to taxable years beginning after 12/31/2019. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD2)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Minimum Wage.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-12-01 Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
2019-04-26HouseConference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-26-19 at 3:00PM in Conference Room 423.
2019-04-26HouseConference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-26-19 at 2:00PM in Conference Room 423.
2019-04-25HouseConference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-26-19 10:00AM in conference room 423.
2019-04-24HouseConference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-25-19 10:00AM in conference room 423.
2019-04-23HouseConference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-24-19 10:00AM in conference room 423.
2019-04-23SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 825).
2019-04-22HouseBill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Tuesday, 04-23-19 4:30PM in conference room 423.
2019-04-22HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 948).
2019-04-22SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: Taniguchi Chair; Keith-Agaran Co-Chair; S. Chang, Fevella.
2019-04-22HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: Johanson, Luke Co-Chairs; Matsumoto.
2019-04-12SenateReceived notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 804).
2019-04-11HouseHouse disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
2019-04-09HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 836) in amended form (SD 2).
2019-04-09SenateReport Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella, Ihara, Kim, K. Rhoads, Riviere, Ruderman, L. Thielen. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2019-04-05Senate48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-19.
2019-04-05SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1926) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2019-03-28SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Riviere; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro.
2019-03-22SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-28-19 10:15AM in conference room 211.
2019-03-21SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2019-03-21SenateReported from LCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1359) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2019-03-14SenateThe committee(s) on LCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LCA were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, S. Chang; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ihara, Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard.
2019-03-11SenateThe committee(s) on LCA has scheduled a public hearing on 03-14-19 2:45PM in conference room 224.
2019-03-05SenateReferred to LCA, WAM.
2019-03-05SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-03-05SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 268).
2019-03-01HousePassed Third Reading with Representative(s) Kong, Matsumoto, Tokioka voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Har, Okimoto, Quinlan, Ward voting no (4) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-03-01HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 997), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2019-02-22HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nishimoto, Wildberger, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Nakamura; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Todd, McDermott.
2019-02-20HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-22-19 12:30PM in House conference room 308.
2019-02-15HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Har, Kong, Matsumoto, Okimoto, Tokioka voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5).
2019-02-15HouseReported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 690) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2019-01-31HouseThe committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Eli, Ichiyama, Kitagawa, McKelvey, Quinlan, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Matsumoto; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-01-28HouseBill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Thursday, 01-31-19 9:30AM in House conference room 309.
2019-01-28HouseReferred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 6
2019-01-24HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2019-01-23HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

HB1191 (Carry Over) 2019-04-26 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-26-19 at 3:00PM in Conference Room 423.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback