HI HB1191 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-01-28 - Referred to VMI, CPC/JUD, referral sheet 6
Pending: House Veterans, Military, & International Affairs, & Culture and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-01-28 - Referred to VMI, CPC/JUD, referral sheet 6
Pending: House Veterans, Military, & International Affairs, & Culture and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates a new chapter to authorize the governor to appoint commissioners to administer oaths, take acknowledgements, and proofs of execution outside of the United States in connection with the execution of conveyance documents relating to a timeshare interest, any property subject to a time share plan, or the operation of a time share plan covering any property located within the State.
Title
Time Shares; Conveyances
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Brower [D] | Rep. Romy Cachola [D] | Rep. John Mizuno [D] | Rep. Rida Cabanilla Arakawa [D] |
Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-28 | House | Referred to VMI, CPC/JUD, referral sheet 6 |
2013-01-24 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB914 (Same As) 2013-04-03 - The committee(s) on CPC/JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1191&year=2013 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2013/Bills/HB1191_.HTM |