HI HB1190 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1190
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-12 - Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 804).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-12 - Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 804).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Changes income tax rates for taxable years beginning after 12/31/2018. Effective 7/1/2035. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Taxation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-12 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 804). |
2019-04-11 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2019-04-09 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 835) in amended form (SD 1). |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-19. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1893) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2019-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Harimoto, Inouye, Kanuha, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) K. Kahele, Kidani, Fevella. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-29-19 10:00AM in conference room 211. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to WAM. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 452). |
2019-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-03-01 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Nakashima excused (2). |
2019-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1163) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2019-02-06 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nakamura. |
2019-02-04 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-06-19 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1190 (Carry Over) 2019-04-12 - Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 804).