HI HB1188 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1188
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Specifies that an affidavit on application for voter registration shall be a part of the application associated with the issuance of a civil identification card and driver's license. Requires each county examiner of drivers to electronically store the contents of the affidavit on application for voter registration provided by applicants in conjunction with their driver's license and civil identification card applications and provide electronic accessibility of this information. Effective 1/1/2018.
Title
Relating To Voting.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-01-30 | House | Referred to TRN, JUD, referral sheet 6 |
2017-01-25 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-24 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB246 (Same As) 2018-01-17 - Re-Referred to JDC/TRE, WAM.
HB1188 (Carry Over) 2017-01-30 - Referred to TRN, JUD, referral sheet 6
HB1188 (Carry Over) 2017-01-30 - Referred to TRN, JUD, referral sheet 6
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1188&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/HB1188_.HTM |