HI HB1185 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1185
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-2)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-15 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-15 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the issuance of general obligation bonds for statewide planning and coordination for transit-oriented development projects identified in the state strategic plan for transit-oriented development. Effective 7/1/3000. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Transit-oriented Development.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2023-02-15 | House | Reported from HSG/WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 445) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2023-02-08 | House | The committee on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Poepoe, Chun, Ganaden, Hashem, Morikawa, Takayama, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2023-02-08 | House | The committee on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Hashimoto, Aiu, Kila, Kitagawa, Marten, Onishi, Todd, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2023-02-03 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG/WAL on Wednesday, 02-08-23 11:00AM in House conference room 312 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-01-30 | House | Referred to HSG/WAL, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2023-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2023-01-24 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1185 (Carry Over) 2023-02-15 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
SB1191 (Same As) 2023-03-24 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ilagan excused (1).
SB1191 (Same As) 2023-03-24 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ilagan excused (1).
Subjects
Appropriation ($)
Counties
DBEDT
GO Bonds
Office of Planning and Sustainable Development
Transit-Oriented Development
Counties
DBEDT
GO Bonds
Office of Planning and Sustainable Development
Transit-Oriented Development