HI HB1184 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1184
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-11 - Recommitted to FIN with Representative Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no and Representative(s) Matsumoto, Mizuno excused.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-11 - Recommitted to FIN with Representative Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no and Representative(s) Matsumoto, Mizuno excused.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts the sale of precious metal bullion from the general excise tax. Effective 7/1/2050. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Taxation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-03 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - House - House Economic Development: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - House - House Economic Development: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-11 | House | Recommitted to FIN with Representative Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no and Representative(s) Matsumoto, Mizuno excused. |
2021-03-09 | House | Deferred one day 03-11-21. |
2021-03-05 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 940), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2021-03-03 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Nishimoto, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 4 Noes: Representative(s) Marten, Perruso, Sayama, Tam; and Excused: none. |
2021-03-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-03-21 2:00PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-18 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates excused (1). |
2021-02-18 | House | Reported from ECD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 436) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2021-02-12 | House | The committees on ECD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Quinlan, Holt, D. Kobayashi, Onishi, Sayama, Takayama, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti. |
2021-02-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by ECD on Friday, 02-12-21 9:30AM in House conference room 312 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-04 | House | Re-referred to ECD, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2021-02-01 | House | Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-26 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1184 (Carry Over) 2021-03-11 - Recommitted to FIN with Representative Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no and Representative(s) Matsumoto, Mizuno excused.