HI HB1181 | 2022 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous HB1181

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Limits compelled disclosure of sources or unpublished information for journalists, newscasters and persons participating in collection or dissemination of news or information of substantial public interest. Establishes exceptions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Evidence.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-10 Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
2021-02-01HouseReferred to JHA, referral sheet 3
2021-01-27HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2021-01-26HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

HB1181 (Carry Over) 2021-02-01 - Referred to JHA, referral sheet 3

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback