HI HB118 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB118
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-22 - Received notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 535).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-22 - Received notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 535).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals the requirement that the state auditor conduct an annual review of certain rapid transit authorities in the State. Provides the auditor with specific direction and scope to complete the audit authorized by Act 1, SSLH 2017. Appropriates funds for the auditor to complete an audit of the Honolulu authority for rapid transportation. Requires the comptroller to withhold vendor contracts reimbursement until the auditor has received all documents that pertain to the reimbursement request. Repeals appointment of two non-voting ex-officio members to the board of directors of the county's rapid transportation authority authorized by Act 1, SSLH 2017. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Government.
Sponsors
Rep. Sylvia Luke [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 2 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-02-26 - House - House Finance: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 2 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-02-26 - House - House Finance: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-22 | House | Received notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 535). |
2020-06-19 | Senate | Senate Conferee(s) discharged. |
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-04-15 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 900). |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: L. Thielen Chair; Dela Cruz Co-Chair; Inouye, Fevella. |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 804). |
2019-04-11 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2019-04-09 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 697) in amended form (SD 1). |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Inouye. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Fevella). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-19. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Reported from GVO/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1875) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Inouye, Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, K. Kahele, Taniguchi. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) L. Thielen, Baker, Kanuha; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Inouye, Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO/WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 04-01-19 10:00AM in conference room 211. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Re-Referred to GVO/WAM. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | The recommendation was not adopted. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) L. Thielen, Kanuha; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 2 No(es): Senator(s) Inouye, Fevella; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Baker. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 03-21-19 2:50PM in conference room 225. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to GVO, WAM. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 336). |
2019-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-03-05 | House | Floor amendment failed with Noes, 1 (Representative(s) Luke). Excused, 0 (none). |
2019-03-05 | House | Floor Amendment No. 3 offered by Rep. Ward. |
2019-03-01 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with Representative(s) Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Nakashima excused (2). |
2019-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1154) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2019-02-26 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nishimoto. |
2019-02-22 | House | Proposed draft of Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-26-19 11:00AM in House conference room 308. |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2019-01-18 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB118 (Carry Over) 2019-04-15 - Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 900).