HI HB1179 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1179
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-27 - Act 204, on 06/27/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1305).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-27 - Act 204, on 06/27/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1305).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a pilot program within the Aina Mauna legacy program of the department of Hawaiian home lands to remove and harvest gorse from Mauna Kea and develop it as a marketable product to expand economic opportunities for native Hawaiians. Requires reports to the legislature. Appropriates funds. Repeals 6/30/2026. (CD1)
Title
Relating To Invasive Species.
Sponsors
Rep. Chris Todd [D] | Rep. Greggor Ilagan [D] | Rep. Jeanne Kapela [D] | Rep. Nicole Lowen [D] |
Rep. Daynette Morikawa [D] | Rep. Mark Nakashima [D] | Rep. David Tarnas [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-29 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-29 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-08 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - Senate - Senate Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-29 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-08 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - Senate - Senate Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-27 | House | Act 204, on 06/27/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1305). |
2022-06-27 | Senate | Act 204, 06/27/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1305). |
2022-05-04 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 824). |
2022-05-03 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 946). |
2022-05-03 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2022-04-29 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-03-22. |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 163-22). |
2022-04-29 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 05-03-22. |
2022-04-29 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 163-22) as amended in (CD 1). |
2022-04-29 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Hashem, Nakashima, Todd, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Perruso. |
2022-04-29 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Inouye, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-04-28 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Friday, 04-29-22 4:15PM in conference room 325. |
2022-04-26 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 918). |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Inouye Co-Chairs; Fevella. |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 718). |
2022-04-18 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Hashem, Nakashima, Todd Co-Chairs; Perruso, Matsumoto. |
2022-04-18 | House | Re-referred to AGR, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 49 |
2022-04-18 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 715). |
2022-04-14 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2022-04-12 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 752) in amended form (SD 1). |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2022-04-08 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-12-22. |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3946) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2022-04-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Kanuha, Kidani, Misalucha, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye. |
2022-04-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-08-22 10:40AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Reported from HWN/AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3481) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2022-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HWN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Keohokalole, Acasio, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara. |
2022-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN deferred the measure until 03-22-22 1:04PM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AEN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Nishihara, Acasio, Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2022-03-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN/AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-21-22 1:30PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Referred to HWN/AEN, WAM. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 6). |
2022-03-03 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Matayoshi, Todd excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2022-03-03 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 740-22), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2022-02-24 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Yamashita, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Todd, Wildberger; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2022-02-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-24-22 11:00AM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2022-02-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey excused (1). |
2022-02-15 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 364-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2022-02-08 | House | The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Takumi, Todd, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) D. Kobayashi, LoPresti. |
2022-02-04 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 02-08-22 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2022-02-03 | House | Re-referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 7 |
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-02-01 | House | Referred to AGR, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-26 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1179 (Carry Over) 2021-02-01 - Referred to AGR, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 3