HI HB1179 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1179
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-01 - Referred to AGR, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 3
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-01 - Referred to AGR, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 3
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a pilot program within the Aina Mauna legacy program of the department of Hawaiian home lands to remove and harvest gorse from Mauna Kea and develop it as a marketable product to expand economic opportunities for native Hawaiians. Requires reports to the legislature. Appropriates funds. Sunsets 6/30/2025.
Title
Relating To Invasive Species.
Sponsors
Rep. Chris Todd [D] | Rep. Greggor Ilagan [D] | Rep. Jeanne Kapela [D] | Rep. Nicole Lowen [D] |
Rep. Daynette Morikawa [D] | Rep. Mark Nakashima [D] | Rep. David Tarnas [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-01 | House | Referred to AGR, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-26 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1179 (Carry Over) 2021-02-01 - Referred to AGR, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 3
Subjects
Appropriation ($)
Department of Hawaiian Home Lands
Gorse
Mauna Kea
Pilot Program
Removal, Harvesting, and Product Development
Department of Hawaiian Home Lands
Gorse
Mauna Kea
Pilot Program
Removal, Harvesting, and Product Development
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1179&year=2021 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2021/bills/HB1179_.HTM |