HI HB1176 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-07 - Act 181, on 07/02/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1309).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-07 - Act 181, on 07/02/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1309).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows the governor to designate the department of land and natural resources to administer or enter into agreements for the administration of a green job youth corps program that provides temporary work and training opportunities to help address the unemployment impacts of the COVID-19 pandemic and support economic diversification. Requires a report to the legislature. Appropriates American Rescue Plan Act funds. (CD1)
Title
Relating To A Job Corps Program.
Sponsors
Rep. Sean Quinlan [D] | Rep. Greggor Ilagan [D] | Rep. Jeanne Kapela [D] | Rep. Nicole Lowen [D] |
Rep. David Tarnas [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-23 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Senate - Senate Labor, Culture and the Arts: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - House - House Economic Development: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Senate - Senate Labor, Culture and the Arts: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - House - House Economic Development: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-07 | House | Act 181, on 07/02/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1309). |
2021-07-07 | Senate | Act 181, 07/02/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1309). |
2021-04-28 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 634). |
2021-04-28 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 858). |
2021-04-27 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) LoPresti excused (1). |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2021-04-23 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-27-21. |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 117). |
2021-04-23 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 04-27-21. |
2021-04-23 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 117) as amended in (CD 1). |
2021-04-23 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Inouye, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-04-23 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Quinlan, Holt, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-04-23 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-23-21 1:30PM in conference room CR 325. |
2021-04-22 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-23-21 11:00AM in conference room CR 325. |
2021-04-20 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-22-21 11:00AM in conference room CR 325. |
2021-04-19 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Tuesday, 04-20-21 10:40AM in conference room CR 325. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 560). |
2021-04-19 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 809). |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Taniguchi Chair; Inouye Co-Chair; Fevella. |
2021-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Quinlan, Holt Co-Chairs; Okimoto. |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 558). |
2021-04-15 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2021-04-13 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 763) in amended form (SD 2). |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2021-04-09 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-13-21. |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1663) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2021-04-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-07-21 9:45AM; CR 211 & Videoconference. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Reported from LCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1260) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2021-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on LCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LCA were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Ihara, Keohokalole, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Chang. |
2021-03-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on LCA has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-21 3:00PM; CR 225 & Videoconference. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Referred to LCA, WAM. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 292). |
2021-03-09 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Sayama excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2021-03-05 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 939), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2021-03-02 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-26 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 03-02-21 11:00AM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-18 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates excused (1). |
2021-02-18 | House | Reported from ECD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 442) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2021-02-12 | House | The committees on ECD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Quinlan, Holt, D. Kobayashi, Sayama, Takayama, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Onishi; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti. |
2021-02-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by ECD on Friday, 02-12-21 9:30AM in House conference room 312 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-01 | House | Referred to ECD, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-26 | House | Pending introduction. |