HI HB1170 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-21 - (H) The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Criminalizes the consumption of or trafficking in dog, cat or equine animal meat for the purpose of human consumption.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public order

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-02-21 (H) The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
2012-02-17 (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-21-12 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
2011-12-01 Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
2011-01-26 (H) Referred to JUD, referral sheet 2
2011-01-26 (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading.
2011-01-25 (H) Pending introduction.

Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback