HI HB1169 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides the land use commission with greater enforcement flexibility in situations where conditions, necessary to be met for a property's land reclassification, are unmet by the petitioner.
Title
Land Use Commission; Imposed Conditions on Land; Land Classification
Sponsors
Rep. Ryan Yamane [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-17 | Carried over to 2016 Regular Session. | |
2015-02-13 | House | The committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2015-02-10 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Friday, 02-13-15 10:00AM in House conference room 325. |
2015-02-02 | House | Referred to WAL, JUD, referral sheet 6 |
2015-01-29 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2015-01-28 | House | Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1169&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/HB1169_.HTM |