HI HB1166 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1166
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the prosecuting attorney to initiate forfeiture proceedings against real property used in promoting gambling in the first degree when any owner of the real property has been convicted of 3 or more separate incidents of promoting gambling in the first degree.
Title
Relating To Gambling.
Sponsors
Rep. Daniel Holt [D] | Rep. Lynn Decoite [D] | Sen. Troy Hashimoto [D] | Rep. Scot Matayoshi [D] |
Rep. Nadine Nakamura [D] | Rep. Sean Quinlan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-02-01 | House | Referred to JHA/CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-26 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1166 (Carry Over) 2021-02-01 - Referred to JHA/CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1166&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/HB1166_.HTM |