HI HB1166 | 2020 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB1166

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Caps the service charges for a primary and secondary ticket seller. Requires website operators to guarantee refunds in certain circumstances and disclose that the website is not the primary ticket seller. Prohibits speculative tickets and the usage of bots. Makes conforming amendments. (HB1166 HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Consumer Protection.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-08 - House - House Economic Development & Business: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-12-01 Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
2019-02-21HouseThe committee(s) on CPC/JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
2019-02-15HouseBill scheduled to be heard by CPC/JUD on Thursday, 02-21-19 2:15PM in House conference room 329.
2019-02-13HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC/JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, McDermott, Mizuno, Nakamura, Ward excused (5).
2019-02-13HouseReported from EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 364) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC/JUD.
2019-02-08HouseThe committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kitagawa, Eli, Ichiyama, Johanson, Quinlan, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Matsumoto.
2019-02-06HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 02-08-19 10:00AM in conference room 309.
2019-02-06HouseThe committee(s) on EDB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-08-19.
2019-02-01HouseBill scheduled to be heard by EDB on Wednesday, 02-06-19 10:10AM in House conference room 309.
2019-01-28HouseReferred to EDB, CPC/JUD, referral sheet 6
2019-01-24HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2019-01-23HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB611 (Same As) 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
HB1166 (Carry Over) 2019-02-21 - The committee(s) on CPC/JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback